VENN
Adm. pens. at ST CATHARINE'S, June 12, 1761. [S. of William, of Leeds and Flasby, Yorks.] B. [Sept. 20, 1742], in Yorkshire. School, Wakefield. ' Matric. Easter, 1762. Migrated to Queens', Oct. 15, 1764; B.A. (6th Wrangler) 1765; M.A. 1768. Fellow of Queens', 1766-75. Senior Proctor, 1774. Ord. deacon (Norwich) May 28, 1765; C. of Brockdish, Norfolk, 1765. R. of St Botolph's, Cambridge, 1771-5. V. of Scawby, Lincs., from 1775. Married, 1775, Mary, dau. of Dr Kenrick Prescott, Master of St Catharine's. Brother of Henry (1757). (M. H. Peacock; Queens' College Order-Book.)
Year | Type | Name as Recorded | Location | Office/Status | Full Record |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1765 | Ordi(letters dimissory) | Preston, Thomas | / | deacon | View |
1765 | Ordi(ordination) | Preston, Thomas | / | deacon | View |
1767 | Ordi(ordination) | Preston, Thomas | / | priest | View |
1771 | Appt(Institution) | Preston, Thomas | Cambridge St Botolph / | Rector | View |
1773 | Appt(Presentation) | Preston, Thomas | Scawby / | Vicar | View |
1773 | Appt(Institution) | Preston, Thomas | Scawby alias Scalby / | Vicar | View |
1774 | Appt(Resignation) | Preston, not given | Cambridge St Botolph / | Rector | View |
1775 | Vac(cession) | Preston, Thomas | Cambridge, St Botolph / | Rector | View |
1827 | Vac(Death) | Preston, Thomas | Scalby / | Vicar | View |