Norris was ordained to the priesthood by Godfrey Goodman on 18.12.1642 (GDR 249A). His letters of orders as a deacon survive (BL, Additional Chart 5845) and were endorsed at Bishop William Nicholson's primary visitation of Gloucester diocese on 24 September 1662.
Foster: son of Richard of Rodborough, Gloucs. pleb., NEW COLLEGE matric. 10 Oct. 1634 aged 16; BA 9 June 1638; MA from HART HALL 8 Feb. 1641/2
Year | Type | Name as Recorded | Location | Office/Status | Full Record |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1642 | Ordi(ordination) | Norris, Danielus | / | deacon | View |
1642 | Ordi(ordination) | Norris, Daniel | / | deacon | View |
1642 | Ordi(ordination) | Norris, Daniel | / | priest | View |
1661 | Libc | Norris, Daniell | Tedbury / | Vicar | View |
1662 | Subsc | Norris, Daniel | Tetbury / | Vicar | View |
1662 | Libc | Norris, Daniell | Tedbury / | Vicar | View |
1684 | Libc | Norris, Daniel | Tetbury / | Vicar | View |
1687 | Vac(natural death) | Norris, Daniel | Tetbury / | Vicar | View |
1687 | Vac(natural death) | Norris, Daniel | Telbury / | Vicar | View |