VENN
Adm. sizar at JESUS, July 23, 1785. Of Notts. [4th s. of the Rev. Edward (CCE18717, 1742-3), V. of Cuckney, Notts. B. there, Oct. 23, 1768. ' Matric. Michs. 1786; Scholar, 1786; B.A. (4th Wrangler) 1790; M.A. 1793. Fellow, 1796-1804; tutor. Ord. deacon, 1791. C. of Helston, Cornwall, and Master of the Grammar School, 1791-6. Travelled with Malthus in Northern Europe, 1799. R. of Colmworth, Hunts., 1804-10. R. of Sturmer, Essex, 1810. R. of Chetwynd, Salop, 1811-22. Private tutor in Oxford, 1822. R. of St Mark's, Kennington, 1825. First Principal of King's College, London, 1830-6. Bishop of Chichester, 1836-40. One of the founders of Chichester Training College. Married, July 3, 1804, Mary Sadleir, dau. of William Bručre, Esq., of Ashtead, Surrey, Governor of Bengal. Author, Life and Remains of E. D. Clarke; Pastoral Addresses; also wrote the memoir of Malthus in his Political Economy, 1836. Died Aug. 20, 1840, at Broadstairs; buried in Chichester Cathedral. Brother of Bentinck R. (1789; CCE18716), John (1778) and Edward (1781; CCE18718); father of the next. (Jesus Coll. Notes; Burke, L.G.; Misc. Gen. et Her., N.S., III. 304; F.M.G., III. 1026; D.N.B.; The Church Magazine, Dec. 1842.)
Life in ODNB by RAB
Year | Type | Name as Recorded | Location | Office/Status | Full Record |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1791 | Appt(Licensing) | Otter, William | Woodhouse / | assistant curate | View |
1791 | Disp-Ord | Otter, William | / | View | |
1791 | Appt(Licensing) | Otter, William | Skegby / | assistant curate | View |
1791 | Ordi(ordination) | Otter, William | / | deacon | View |
1791 | Subsc | Otter, William | / | View | |
1791 | Ordi(letters dimissory) | Otter, William | / | deacon | View |
1796 | Appt(Institution) | Otter, William | Jesus College, Cambridge / | Fellow | View |
1797 | Disp-Ord | Otter, William | / | View | |
1797 | Ordi(ordination) | Otter, William | / | priest | View |
1799 | Appt(Institution) | Otter, William | Sturmer / | Rector | View |
1804 | Appt(Institution) | Otter, William | Colmworth / | Rector | View |
1804 | Disp(Dispensation) | Otter, William | Colmworth / | Rector | View |
1804 | Disp-App | Otter, William | Sturmer / | Rector | View |
1804 | Appt(in post) | Otter, William | George Byng, viscount Torrington / | domestic chaplain | View |
1804 | Disp-App | Otter, William | Rt. Hon. George Byng, Lord Viscount Torrington / | Chaplain | View |
1804 | Disp-App | Otter, William | Sturmere / | Rector | View |
1804 | Disp(Dispensation) | Otter, William | Colmworth / | Rector | View |
1806 | Vac(marriage) | Otter, William | Jesus College, Cambridge / | Fellow | View |
1810 | Appt(Institution) | Otter, William | Sturmer / | Rector | View |
1810 | Vac(cession) | Otter, William | Sturmer / | Rector | View |
1810 | Vac(cession) | Otter, William | Colmworth / | Rector | View |
1811 | Appt(Institution) | Otter, William | Chetwyn otherwise Chetwynd / | Rector | View |
1811 | Appt(Institution) | Otter, William | Chetwyn otherwise Chetwynd / | Rector | View |
1811 | Appt(Institution) | Otter, William | Alrewas / | Vicar | View |
1811 | Vac(cession) | Otter, William | Chetwyn otherwise Chetwynd / | Rector | View |
1811 | Vac(cession) | OTTER, William | Sturmer / | Rector | View |
1812 | Appt(Induction Mandate) | Otter, William | Alrewas / | Vicar | View |
1816 | Appt(in post) | Otter, William | Duke of Portland / | domestic chaplain | View |
1816 | Appt(Institution) | Otter, William | Kinlet / | Vicar | View |
1816 | Disp(Dispensation) | Otter, William | Kinlet / | Vicar | View |
1816 | Disp-App | Otter, William | Most Noble William, Duke of Portland. / | Chaplain | View |
1816 | Disp-App | Otter, William | Chetwynd / | Rector | View |
1816 | Appt(Appointment) | Otter, William | William Henry, Duke of Portland / | domestic chaplain | View |
1818 | Vac(resignation) | Otter, William | Alrewas / | Vicar | View |
1818 | Vac(resignation) | Otter, William | Alrewas / | Vicar | View |
1818 | Appt(Resignation) | Otter, William | Alrewas / | Vicar | View |
1824 | Appt(Licensing) | Otter, William | Kennington, St. Luke / | Minister | View |
1827 | Vac(resignation) | Otter, William | Coverham Holy Trinity / | Deacon | View |
1827 | Vac(resignation) | Otter, William | Coverham / Horshouse | Perpetual Curate | View |