VENN
Adm. pens. at CLARE, May 14, 1730. S. of John. B. at Coston, Leics. School, Oakham. ' Matric. 1730. Migrated to Christ's, Jan. 19, 1730-1. Scholar, 1731; B.A. 1733-4. Ord. deacon (Lincoln) June 9, 1734; priest, June 20, 1736. R. of Teigh, Rutland, 1737. R. of Saxby and Stapleford, Leics., 1745-63. Died Apr. 18, 1763, aged 52. M.I. at Coston. (Peile, II. 225; Nichols, II. 145.)
Year | Type | Name as Recorded | Location | Office/Status | Full Record |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1734 | Ordi(ordination) | Bullivant, Daniel | / | deacon | View |
1734 | Appt(Licensing) | Bullivant, Daniel | Coston / | Curate | View |
1736 | Ordi(ordination) | Bulivant, Daniel | / | priest | View |
1736 | Appt(Licensing) | Bulivant, Daniel | Coston / | Curate | View |
1737 | Appt(Institution) | Bullivant, Daniel | Teigh / | Rector | View |
1737 | Appt(Institution) | Bullivant, Daniel | Gunby / | Rector | View |
1743 | Vac(resignation) | Bullivant, Daniel | Teigh / | Rector | View |
1745 | Appt(Institution) | Bullivant, Daniel | Saxby / | Rector | View |
1745 | Appt(Institution) | Bullivant, Daniel | Stapleford / | Vicar | View |
1745 | Vac(cession) | Bullivant, Daniel | Gunby / | Rector | View |
1750 | Appt(Appointment) | Bullivant, Daniel | Bennet, Earl of Harborough / | domestic chaplain | View |
1763 | Vac(Death) | Bullivant, Daniel | Saxby / | Rector | View |
1763 | Vac(Death) | Bullivant, Daniel | Stapleford / | Vicar | View |